# Multiplication Trick Help

Multiplication help?! I suck!?

Sooo... I have really bad memory and things i learn fade within a day! And i forgotten my timestabe haha, i know my 1s,2s,3s,5,9s,10s,11s and 12s but i completly suck at 6,7,8 ,4 im 14 nearly 15 and i need help, ive tried websites, tricks and stuff but nothing works >.<. i really need help with this, andso school starts in 2 and bit weeks! Maths sucks literally! Evryone hates it ! And the thing is at the very first lesson back at school they do revision stuuf like a teachrr randomly picks a student and asks basic but mostly hard Qs.. So yeah im stuck???

Is there anyway i can get to know and memorize them in time??!?

Multiplication tricks for the twelves!!!

1 to 4 The tens digit is the same as the multiplier

The units digit goes up by 2

1 ==>12

2 ==> 24

3==> 36

4==> 48

5 ====> 60

6 to7 The 10s digit is one more than the multiplier

The units digit goes up by 2

6 ====> 72

7=====> 84

8======>96

9 ====> 108

10====> 120 like all the other 10s

11 & 12 Same as 6 to 8

11====> 132

12====> 144

Help me teach multiplication!?

Use this little jingle that my Uncle Ed taught me:

5 times six is thirty-six!

8 time eleven is a twenty-two!

4 times pi is a fist in the eye!

3 times 3 is ze-e-e-e-ro!

There is a second verse, but I can't remember it.

Email me if you need help with division.

John Z

Multiplication and math help?

786 x 46 = 30440 + 4716 = 35156 That is by using 'long multiplication'.

Where does the decimal point go?

Method #1

Note that the first factor has decimals to two places and the second factor has decimals to one place.

Hence 2 place + one place = 3 places.

So the answer must have decimals to 3 places.

Ans: 35.156

Method #2

Note that the two whole numbers are '7' & '4' . 7 x 4 = 28. So answer must be greater than '28'.

The next whole numbers would be '8' & '5' . 8 x 5 = 40 So answer must be less than '40'.

Since long multiplcation gives an answer of '35156'. Then 35.156 would be correct as 3.5156 is too small and 351.56 is too large. Also '35.156' agrees with the answer to method # 1.

Hope that helps!!!!

Multiplication Tables Help?

Not really, but really it is not that difficult... one trick is...

any number with a zero at the end, jsut drop the zero and multiply so if you had to multiply 14*20... drop the zero and multiply 14*2, you get 28... then just add the zero back on... so 20*14 is 280... :) prolly wont help too much with the other multiplications but eh... also, remember the rule...

a*b = b*a

so 2*14 = 14 * 2 = 28

15*5 = 5*15 = 75 and so on...

of course 1*any number is that number...

1*3 = 3

1*4 = 4 of course...

and split up number as well...

so 14*13 can also be 14*10 + 14*3

this is called the distributive property of multiplication... because 13 also is equal to 10 + 3 the answer to 14*13 = 14*(10+3) = 14*10 + 3*14... you can even break that up further if you need to...

because 3*14 = 3*(10+4) = 3*10 +3*4

14*13 = 14*10+14*3 = 14*10+3*10+3*4 = 140+30+12=182!

remember anything multiplied by 10 you just add a zero to the end or move the decimal 1 spot to the right...

hope this helped :)

Can any one tell me the multiplication trick for 2 digit numbers?

For any numbers greater than [math]90[/math], let me give you the trick:Let us take [math]97[/math] x [math]94[/math]:Step 1: Find [math]100 - x[/math], where [math]x[/math] is the number.[math]100 - 97 = 3[/math][math]100 - 94 = 6[/math]Step 2: Subtract the difference of any number from the other number.[math]97 - 6 = 91[/math]or[math]94 - 3 = 91[/math]Both cases will give you the same result. This becomes the first two digits of the result.Step 3: To get the last two digits, multiply both the differences ([math]100 - x[/math]).[math]3[/math] x [math]6 = 18[/math]Step 4: Thus the answer becomes [math]9118[/math].Note: If the product of differences is a single digit number, then zero must be placed before it to get the last two digits.Extension of this rule: The same method can be used to calculate the product of any two numbers from 80 to 99, since it is still easy to calculate the product of differences of these numbers. In this case, if the product of differences (obtained in Step 3) is a three digit number, then the first digit of it should be added to the last digit of the first two digits obtained in Step 1.Another Application: The same method can be used to find square of a number between 80 and 99. For this the difference (only one, since both numbers are equal) should be squared.Like us on Facebook: MatheMagic

What are some multiplication tricks in Mind Maths?

I hope this answer will help youFirst thing I want you to mention is this is applicable for numbers closer to 100Case 1 : Number is less than 100Try to find the product of 98*97 in mind…… I hope it is an Herculean task without paper or calculator.98*97 = ?????So how we do it……..Step 1 : Find the difference from 100 for each number100 -98 = 2100 -97 = 3Step 2: Cross subtract the difference98 - 3 = 95 or 97 - 2 = 95Step 3 : Cross product the difference into two digit3*2 = 06So we are done98*97 = 9506Case 2 : Number is greater than 100What is 101*107 =??? !!!!!Step 1 is same as mentioned above (but take only the magnitude i.e drop negative sign)Step 2 : Cross add the difference101 - 100 = 1107 - 100 = 7Crossing adding101 + 7 = 108 or 107 + 1 = 108Step 3 : Cross product the difference into two digit7*1 = 07So we are done101*107 = 10807So I hope this helped you if so UPVOTE

What are math tricks for fast multiplication?

*i already posted this somewhere else but i guess it’s a nice trick so take a look*One that I like to use is the “multiplication by 11″NOTE: Here, i am not using bracket as a means of multiplication. It is for understanding purposes!OK, obviously from 0 to 10, the multiplication by 11 is easy and very straightforward.2 * 11 = 22Nothing great here…It starts to get pretty interesting after 10 and so onFor instance, 11 * 11 = 121 right?We all know it as a square number…But look at it this way:11 * 11 = 1(1+1)1 = 121Another one, 15 * 11 = 1(1+5)5 = 165More? 21 * 11 = 2(2+1)1 = 231Again 43 * 11 = 4(4+3)3 = 473Now, you’ll tell me: “What about the sum in the bracket adding to more than 9?”Relax man…Take a look, 39 * 11 = 3(3+9)9 = 3(12)9 = 429Yep! Just add 1 to the number before it!98 * 11 = 9(9+8)8 = 9(17)8 = 1078OK so now what about numbers >99 ?Well… nothing much…Just leave only the unit number in the bracket and add the other number to the number before it! You don’t understand? Then look!548 * 11 = 54(54+8)8 = 54(62)8 = 54+6(2)8 = 6028998 * 11 = 99(99+8)8 = 99(107)8 = 99+10(7)8 = 10978One last for you: 9998 * 11 = 999(999+8)8 = 999(1007)8 = 999+100(7)8 = 109978And i could go on and on…So there you go!

Whats a trick to doing multiplication numbers like 54X45 or 56X65?

Work out...

6 * 6 * 9 * 9...

Good luck!

What are interesting math tricks to help do multiplication, division, subtraction, addition, etc, faster?

Hey,If you are looking for multiplication tricks, you need to watch this video. Multiplying any two 2 digit number in 3 seconds. | Beyond the ClassroomDo subscribe (Beyond the Classroom) for more such content coming your way.